EP0119258 - A SAFETY RAZOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02190 / US | [1984/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Chester, Frederick 10 Pinecone Lane Southboro, MA 01772 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903248.9 | 14.09.1983 | [1984/39] | WO1983US01411 | Priority number, date | US19820419186 | 17.09.1982 Original published format: US 419186 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401122 | Date: | 29.03.1984 | [1984/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119258 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119258 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/06 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/225 (EP,US);
B26B21/227 (EP,US);
B26B21/521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/39] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSRASIERER | [1984/39] | English: | A SAFETY RAZOR | [1984/39] | French: | RASOIR DE SECURITE | [1984/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1984 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1984 | Search fee paid | 16.03.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 08.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3950849 (PERRY ROGER L); | [AD]US4083104 (NISSEN WARREN I, et al); | [YD]US4270268 (JACOBSON CHESTER F) | International search | [Y]US4308663 (CIAFFONE JOHN T); | [X]US4335508 (FRANCIS JOHN F, et al); | [Y]US4347663 (ULLMO ANDRE A) |