EP0159314 - NOISE SUBTRACTION FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPLORATION LOGGING, INC. P.O. Box 214676 Sacramento, CA 95815 / US | [1985/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEDA, T. 1643 LeRoy Avenue Berkeley, CA 94709 / US | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/44] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903340.4 | 26.09.1983 | [1985/44] | WO1983US01494 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501586 | Date: | 11.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159314 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/40, G06F7/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
E21B47/18 (EP);
G01V1/36 (EP);
H03H21/00 (EP);
G01V2210/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/44] | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHSUBTRAHIERENDER FILTER | [1985/44] | English: | NOISE SUBTRACTION FILTER | [1985/44] | French: | FILTRE D'AMORTISSEMENT DU BRUIT | [1985/44] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.1985 | Search fee paid | 09.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 21.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/26] | 16.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0078907 (DRESSER IND [US]) | International search | [Y]US3484591 (TRIMBLE CHARLES R); | [Y]US3714590 (FREEMAN F, et al); | [Y]US4025724 (DAVIDSON JR ALLEN R, et al); | [A]US4144578 (MUELLER MARTIN, et al); | [Y]US4193118 (LINFORD JOHN R [US], et al); | [YP]US4357673 (WILLIS BARRY G, et al) |