EP0154623 - DUAL-MODE ELECTRON GUN WITH IMPROVED SHADOW GRID ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1988 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | [1986/28] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBOSS, Kurt 751 Haverform Avenue Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | [1985/38] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903359.4 | 17.10.1983 | [1985/38] | WO1983US01623 | Priority number, date | US19830527724 | 30.08.1983 Original published format: US 527724 | [1985/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501150 | Date: | 14.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154623 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154623 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01J23/065 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
H01J23/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/38] | Title | German: | IN ZWEI BETRIEBSARTEN UMSCHALTBARER ELEKTRONENSTRAHLERZEUGER MIT VERBESSERTER SCHATTENGITTERVORRICHTUNG | [1985/38] | English: | DUAL-MODE ELECTRON GUN WITH IMPROVED SHADOW GRID ARRANGEMENT | [1985/38] | French: | CANON A ELECTRONS A MODE DOUBLE PRESENTANT UNE AMELIORATION DE L'AGENCEMENT DE LA GRILLE D'OMBRE | [1985/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 13.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3859552 (HECHTEL RICHARD); | [Y]US4023061 (BERWICK ALBERT EDWARD, et al) |