EP0129547 - AUTOMATIC SELECTION APPARATUS FOR TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1985 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERNE, Hansjörg Im Trichtisal 4 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | For all designated states GERBER, Urs Griesernweg 50 8037 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/01] | For all designated states ERNE, Hansjörg Im Trichtisal 4 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | ||
For all designated states GERBER, Urs Griesernweg 50 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/01] | Application number, filing date | 83903368.5 | 15.11.1983 | [1985/01] | WO1983CH00125 | Priority number, date | CH19820007344 | 16.12.1982 Original published format: CH 734482 | [1985/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402440 | Date: | 21.06.1984 | [1984/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129547 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/01] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/274 | [1985/01] | CPC: |
H04M1/2747 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/01] | Title | German: | TELEFON-WÄHLAUTOMAT | [1985/01] | English: | AUTOMATIC SELECTION APPARATUS FOR TELEPHONE | [1985/01] | French: | APPAREIL DE SELECTION AUTOMATIQUE POUR TELEPHONE | [1985/01] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/30] | 28.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 17.09.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.12.1984 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]USH966995H ; | [A]FR2481866 (FAYE ANDRE [FR]); | [X]FR2494063 (PERITEL [FR]) |