EP0128161 - FUEL NOZZLE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1988 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMAROFF, Iwan Schwabelweiser Weg 13a D-8400 Regensburg / DE | [1984/51] | Application number, filing date | 83903782.7 | 22.11.1983 | [1984/51] | WO1983DE00195 | Priority number, date | DE19823246916 | 18.12.1982 Original published format: DE 3246916 | [1984/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402379 | Date: | 21.06.1984 | [1984/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128161 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128161 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/08 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
F02M61/20 (EP);
F02M61/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/51] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZDÜSE FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [1984/51] | English: | FUEL NOZZLE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1984/51] | French: | GICLEUR DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1984/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2289756 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]); | [X]FR2307976 (CAV LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2086473 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]GB2099077 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [AP]EP0084662 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |