EP0116823 - Ultrasonic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forster, Alfred Nariskerstrasse 3 D-8460 Schwandorf / DE | [1984/35] | Application number, filing date | 84100061.5 | 04.01.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | DE19833301848 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3301848 | [1984/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116823 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116823 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/00 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
G01N29/245 (EP);
G10K11/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/35] | Title | German: | Ultraschallwandler | [1984/35] | English: | Ultrasonic transducer | [1984/35] | French: | Transducteur ultrasonique | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 16.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4326274 (HOTTA MITSUHIKO, et al); | [Y]US3427481 (LENAHAN JAMES L, et al); | [A]GB2063007 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [AD]FR2325266 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US3950660 (MCELROY JERRY T) |