EP0116825 - New aryloxypropanolamine derivatives, process for the preparation thereof, pharmaceutical compositions and therapeutic use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERREL S.p.A. Via Depretis, 88 80100 Napoli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states Pierrel S.p.A. Via Depretis, 88 I-80100 Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casagrande, Cesare Via Campogallo 21/67 Arese (Milan) / IT | 02 /
Nicola, Massimo Via Matteotti, 81 Pavia / IT | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 84100085.4 | 06.01.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | IT19830019219 | 21.01.1983 Original published format: IT 1921983 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116825 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116825 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/72, C07D405/04, A61K31/415 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
C07D303/22 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Aryloxypropanolaminderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, pharmazeutische Präparate und therapeutische Anwendung | [1984/35] | English: | New aryloxypropanolamine derivatives, process for the preparation thereof, pharmaceutical compositions and therapeutic use | [1984/35] | French: | Dérivés d'aryloxypropanolamines, leur procédé de préparation, compositions pharmaceutiques et leur utilisation thérapeutique | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 14.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.1987 | NL | 16.12.1987 | LU | 31.01.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/13] | AT | 16.12.1987 | |
NL | 16.12.1987 | ||
Former [1989/10] | NL | 16.12.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1345075 [ ] (PFIZER LTD); | DE2644833 [ ] (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM); | EP0041652 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |