EP0115275 - Video recorder drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/32] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schandl, Hartmut Egerstrasse 2 D-7732 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1984/32] | Application number, filing date | 84100142.3 | 09.01.1984 | [1984/32] | Priority number, date | DE19833300303 | 07.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3300303 | DE19833300378 | 07.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3300378 | [1984/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115275 | Date: | 08.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115275 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/60 | [1984/32] | CPC: |
G11B15/61 (EP);
G11B5/52 (KR);
H04N5/782 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/32] | Title | German: | Laufwerk für einen Videorecorder | [1984/32] | English: | Video recorder drive | [1984/32] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour enregistreur vidéo | [1984/32] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 08.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.1986 | 02.02.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3996619 [ ] (FIRTH RONALD R); | DE1462120 [ ] (VICTOR COMPANY); | FR2342538 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | FR2281607 [ ] (STAAR SA [BE]); | FR2373853 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | US3943566 [ ] (BROCK GEORGE W, et al); | US3614831 [ ] (GRUNDTNER MATTHIAS J, et al); | DE2519700 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | US3697676 [ ] (PROTAS ARTHUR I); | US2919314 [ ] (HOLT ARTHUR W); | DE927999 [ ] (TELEFUNKEN GMBH) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 17, Nr. 4, September 1974, Seite 1188, New York, US |