EP0117973 - Small modular machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maier & Co. Friedrich-Maier-Strasse 9 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [1984/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vesely, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Oberfeldstrasse 16 A-5082 Groedig / AT | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/37] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100162.1 | 09.01.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | DE19833300553 | 10.01.1983 Original published format: DE 3300553 | [1984/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0117973 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0117973 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q37/00, B23Q3/10 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
B23Q37/00 (EP,US);
B23Q3/103 (EP,US);
Y10T29/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5107 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5112 (EP,US);
Y10T408/91 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1984/37] | B23Q37/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/42] |
Former [1984/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Bausatz für Kleinwerkzeugmaschinen | [1984/37] | English: | Small modular machine tool | [1984/37] | French: | Machine-outil modulaire de petites dimensions | [1984/37] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LI, LU | 19.07.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 24.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/11] | 20.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.02.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 09.02.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.02.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 09.02.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE627575 ; | [X]GB104544 (COMPAYNE LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2676413 (WILLIAM WHARTON, et al); | [Y]US2696765 (APPLETON JOE S); | [A]CH435864 (ERNST HEINKEL AKTIENGESELLSCHA [DE]); | [A]DE2044110 (FORTUNA WERKE MASCHF AG); | [Y]DE2205708 (BERNARDI RENATO); | [Y]DE2356343 (HALDER ERWIN); | [Y]CH597959 (GARBINI LOUIS K); | [X]DE2722219 (CHRIST GEB HOFFMANN URSULA); | [A]WO8000322 (OSSBAHR C); | [A]DE3107663 (HURTH MASCH ZAHNRAD CARL [DE]); | [T]WO8400512 (SUHNER INTERTRADE AG [CH]); | [E]DE3232055 (ZIESLING KONRAD) | [Y] - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK, ZEITSCHRIFT F]R INDUSTRIELLE FERTIGUNG, Band 65, 1975, Seiten 21-24, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE; K. MAIER: "Konstruktionsbauk{sten in der Industrie" |