EP0118664 - Device for the storage and presentation of plane objects, especially pictures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1986 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUHE-WERK SÜLTMANN GmbH & Co. KG Zum Torfmoor 17 D-2090 Winsen/Luhe / DE | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newinger, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 48 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 1 / DE | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1984/38] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Rau & Schneck Königstrasse 2 D-8500 Nürnberg 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100255.3 | 12.01.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | DE19833304128 | 08.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3304128 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118664 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118664 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G09F15/00, G09F5/00 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
G09F15/0087 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/39] | G09F15/00, G09F5/00 | ||
Former IPC [1984/38] | G09F5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1984/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung und Präsentation von flachen Gegenständen, insbesondere von Bildern | [1984/38] | English: | Device for the storage and presentation of plane objects, especially pictures | [1984/38] | French: | Dispositif pour emmagasiner et présenter des objets plans, particulièrement des images | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 11.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/52] | 09.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.04.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1988870U ; | [A]US2547368 ; | [A]US3732633 |