EP0139070 - Camping tent applicable to a two-wheeled vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DETTO PIETRO S.r.l. Via Marconi, 20 Lavanderie di Segrate (Milano) / IT | [1985/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colombo, Stefano Via Juvara 26 Milan / IT | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1985/18] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84100369.2 | 16.01.1984 | [1985/18] | Priority number, date | IT19830023440 | 25.10.1983 Original published format: IT 2344083 | [1985/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0139070 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0139070 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/06 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
E04H15/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, LU, NL [1985/18] | Title | German: | Campingzelt geeignet für ein Zweiradfahrzeug | [1985/30] | English: | Camping tent applicable to a two-wheeled vehicle | [1985/18] | French: | Tente de camping adaptée à un véhicule à deux roues | [1985/30] |
Former [1985/30] | Campingzelt geeignet für ein Zweirad fahrzeug | File destroyed: | 11.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191029065 (PRICE JOHN DUDLEY); | [A]GB191420217 (FINKELSTONE BARNET); | [A]FR1039969 ; | [Y]DE2652519 (HERBEZ FRANCOIS G A); | [Y]US4355649 (DERAGON ALLEN E) |