EP0117406 - Automatically balancing and vertically justifying text and/or graphics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartlett, Geoffrey McSwain 43 Stonecrest Road Ridgefield Connecticut 06877 / US | 02 /
Hofmeister, James Pierson 4712 Paseo Tubutman Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | 03 /
Nye, Derald Dean Rt. 7, Box 511 Tucson Arizona 85747 / US | 04 /
Pring, Edward John 8260 E. Moonstone Tucson Arizona 85715 / US | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars E. Ericsson Microelectronics AB Department for IPR 164 81 Kista / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1987/49] | Appleton, John Edward IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1984/36] | Lewis, Alan John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 84100441.9 | 17.01.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | US19830469181 | 23.02.1983 Original published format: US 469181 | [1984/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0117406 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0117406 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117406 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
G06F40/177 (EP,US);
G06F40/189 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/36] | Title | German: | Automatische Balancierung und vertikale Justierung von Text und/oder von graphischen Darstellungen | [1984/36] | English: | Automatically balancing and vertically justifying text and/or graphics | [1984/36] | French: | Equilibrage automatique et justification verticale de texte et/ou de graphiques | [1984/36] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4007442 (FINDLEY GERALD IVAN, et al); | [AD]US4207011 (PASCOE ROBERT A [US]); | [A]US4335940 (MORGAN GRANT T); | [A]US4216373 (SEELY CHARLES R [US]) |