EP0114667 - Button-type electrochemical generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Anonyme dite SAFT 156, avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | [1984/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Descroix, Jean-Pierre 16bis rue de Neuilly F-94120 Fontenay Sous Bois / FR | 02 /
Evereare, Christian 76, avenue d'Estienne d'Orves F-94340 Joinville Le Pont / FR | 03 /
Racine, Guy 21, Allée Paul Eluard F-77270 Villeparisis / FR | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100531.7 | 19.01.1984 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | FR19830000903 | 21.01.1983 Original published format: FR 8300903 | [1984/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114667 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114667 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114667 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/46, H01M6/38 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
H01M10/0463 (EP);
H01M50/50 (EP,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP);
H01M10/0468 (EP);
H01M6/38 (EP);
H01M6/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1984/31] | H01M6/46, H01M10/04, H01M6/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Knopfförmiger elektrochemischer Generator | [1984/31] | English: | Button-type electrochemical generator | [1984/31] | French: | Générateur électrochimique de type bouton | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 02.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.06.1988 | SE | 30.06.1988 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/23] | SE | 30.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1024163 ; | [YD]US3094438 (DALEY JOHN L S, et al); | [A]US3148090 (SEYMOUR SASLOW); | [A]FR1497405 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [A]US3445295 (SMITH HOLLEY R, et al); | [X]GB1209336 (WONDER PILES [FR]); | [Y]FR2471674 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |