EP0115803 - Disc-shaped photovoltaic cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pschunder, Willi Im Ring 43 D-7129 Ilsfeld / DE | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Maute, Hans-Jürgen DaimlerChrysler AG, Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100622.4 | 20.01.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | DE19833303926 | 05.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3303926 | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115803 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115803 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/02, H01L31/18 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
H01L31/188 (EP,US);
H01L31/02008 (EP,US);
H01L31/0508 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/33] | H01L31/02, H01L31/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, NL [1984/33] | Title | German: | Scheibenförmige Solarzelle | [1984/33] | English: | Disc-shaped photovoltaic cell | [1984/33] | French: | Cellule photovoltaique en forme de disque | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/52] | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.02.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4301322 (AMICK JAMES A); | [Y]EP0048829 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3493437 (YASUI ROBERT K); | [X]DE2757301 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2919041 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]GB2107928 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]FR2350696 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]); | [A]FR2502400 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [A]GB2062351 (LICENTIA GMBH) | [A] - RAUMFAHRTFORSCHUNG, Heft 5, Oktober 1969, Seiten 205-212, M}nchenDE; E. SUPPA et al.: "Neue technologische Verfahren f}r Solarzellenanlagen" |