EP0117433 - RIM process using single component composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.10.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44318 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Wei-Yeih Wayne 14339 Lisa Drive Maple Heights Ohio 44137 / US | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1984/36] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100771.9 | 25.01.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | US19830461344 | 27.01.1983 Original published format: US 461344 | [1984/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117433 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/20 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
C08G69/16 (EP);
C08G69/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/36] | Title | German: | RIM-Verfahren unter Verwendung einer Monokomponenten-Zusammensetzung | [1984/36] | English: | RIM process using single component composition | [1984/36] | French: | Procédé RIM utilisant une composition à un seul constituant | [1984/36] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/26] | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1990/47] | 07.07.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.03.1985 | M02   Fee paid on   12.04.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DD128751 [ ]; | US3304291 [ ]; | GB1098938 [ ]; | AT264133B [ ]; | CH414160 [ ]; | DE1495219 [ ]; | GB1241341 [ ] |