EP0115849 - Teaching model for educational purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welte, Walter Wollmatinger Strasse 181 D-7750 Konstanz / DE | [1984/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100996.2 | 01.02.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | DE19833303385 | 02.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3303385 | [1984/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115849 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115849 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115849 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/00, G09B19/24 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
G09B19/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | Lehrmodell für Ausbildungszwecke | [1984/33] | English: | Teaching model for educational purposes | [1984/33] | French: | Maquette à fins éducatives | [1984/33] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 26.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.08.1989 | IT | 02.08.1989 | SE | 02.08.1989 | LU | 28.02.1990 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | GB | 02.08.1989 | |
IT | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
LU | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 02.08.1989 | |
IT | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 02.08.1989 | |
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | SE | 02.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB977723 (EUTECTIC WELDING ALLOYS); | [A]US3904845 (MINKIEWICZ EDMOND ANDRE); | [A]US4123853 (DICKENSHEET JANIS A); | [A]US4124944 (BLAIR BRUCE A); | [A]US4132014 (SCHOW HARVEY B) | [A] - WELDING JOURNAL, Band 57, Nr. 4, April 1978, Seiten 25-30; R.E. LONG u.a.: "Welding training instructional media system" |