EP0116900 - Ski shoe sole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faulin, Antonio Via G. da Procida, 4 I-20149 Milano / IT | [1984/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84101310.5 | 09.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | IT19830019671 | 21.02.1983 Original published format: IT 1967183 | [1984/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116900 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116900 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
A43B5/0417 (EP,US);
A43B5/0423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | Sohle für Skischuh | [1984/35] | English: | Ski shoe sole | [1984/35] | French: | Semelle pour chaussure de ski | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.1987 | BE | 07.01.1987 | CH | 07.01.1987 | FR | 07.01.1987 | LI | 07.01.1987 | NL | 07.01.1987 | SE | 31.01.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/23] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
BE | 07.01.1987 | ||
CH | 07.01.1987 | ||
LI | 07.01.1987 | ||
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
SE | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/17] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
BE | 07.01.1987 | ||
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
SE | 31.01.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 07.01.1987 | |
BE | 07.01.1987 | ||
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
Former [1988/43] | BE | 07.01.1987 | |
NL | 07.01.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 07.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1785260 (HOFFMANN GMBH GUSTAV); | [AD]EP0014892 (FAULIN ANTONIO) |