EP0122390 - Light source for culturing plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/43] | Filter carrying condenser lens | ||
[1988/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101492.1 | 14.02.1984 | [1984/43] | Priority number, date | JP19830022573 | 14.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2257383 | JP19830028911 | 23.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2891183 | [1984/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122390 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122390 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G02B19/00, G02B5/20 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
G02B5/20 (EP,US);
A01G7/045 (US);
A01G9/249 (EP);
G02B19/0028 (EP,US);
G02B19/0047 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/43] | Title | German: | Lichtquelle zur Kultivierung von Pflanzen | [1988/25] | English: | Light source for culturing plants | [1988/25] | French: | Source lumineuse pour la culture des plantes | [1988/25] |
Former [1984/43] | Kondenserlinse mit Filterschicht | ||
Former [1984/43] | Filter carrying condenser lens | ||
Former [1984/43] | Condenseur avec couche filtrante | Examination procedure | 14.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 30.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE7123708U ; | [Y]US2758510 (MAX AUWARTER); | [Y]AT226993B (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [A]DE1772951 (BOSCH PHOTOKINO GMBH); | [Y]DE2136299 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2703688 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE7813480U ; | [A]DE2931309 (AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP); | [A]EP0026710 (POULLAIN MARCEL BERNARD [FR], et al); | [A]US4277129 (TAUCHER KENNETH F); | [A]EP0062847 (MORI KEI) |