EP0118794 - Chromene derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALKALOIDA VEGYéSZETI GYáR Postfach 1 H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timar, Tibor, Dr. Dipl. Ing. Chem. Elmunkás u. 27 H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | 02 /
Zsupán, Kálmán, Dr. Dipl. Ing. Chem. Elmunkás u. 23/a H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | 03 /
Répási, János, Dr. Elmunkás u. 1 H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | 04 /
Borsos geb. Safranek, Irén Elmunkás u. 21 H-4440 Tiszavasvári / HU | 05 /
Kiss, István, Dr. Zöldfa u. 4 H-6723 Szeged / HU | 06 /
Fodor, András, Dr. Retek u. 2 H-6723 Szeged / HU | 07 /
Maróy, Péter, Dr. Ürhajós u. 5/a H-6723 Szeged / HU | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/38] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101540.7 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | HU19830000504 | 15.02.1983 Original published format: HU 50483 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118794 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118794 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/58, C07D311/60, C07D311/64, C07D311/70, C07D493/04, A01N43/16, A01N43/24 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/16 (EP,US);
A01N43/24 (EP,US);
A01N43/30 (EP,US);
A01N43/32 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/84 (EP,US);
C07D311/58 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Neue Chromen-Derivate | [1984/38] | English: | Chromene derivatives | [1984/38] | French: | Dérivés de chromènes | [1984/38] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 28.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86107710.5 / EP0208147 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2639671 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC); | [X]DE2833067 (EISAI CO LTD); | [XD]US4162326 (MIHAILOVSKI ALEXANDER [US]) | [XD] - NATURE, Band 281, 18. Oktober 1979, Seiten 570-572, MacMillan Journals Ltd., London, GB | [AD] - NATURE, Band 284, 27. März 1980, Seiten 320-323, MacMillan Journals Ltd., London, GB | Examination | - Organisch-chemische Nomenklatur,Frobenius, Wissenschaftliche Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, Stuttgart 1983 |