EP0116947 - Container with bottom unloader for solid material, especially waste paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rühland, Lothar Grasgarten 34 D-38176 Wendeburg / DE | [1984/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101547.2 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | DE19833305972 | 21.02.1983 Original published format: DE 3305972 | [1984/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116947 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116947 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/62 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
B65F1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/35] | Title | German: | Sammelbehälter mit Bodenentleerung für Feststoffe, insbesondere Altpapier | [1984/35] | English: | Container with bottom unloader for solid material, especially waste paper | [1984/35] | French: | Conteneur avec dispositif de décharge à sa partie inférieure, particulièrement pour vieux papiers | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2500422 (UTPM [FR]); | [A]GB2101570 (RUHLAND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |