EP0123803 - Interference reduction characteristics circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1988 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaltbau Gesellschaft mbH Klausenburger Strasse 6 D-81677 München / DE | [1984/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junck, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Am Lilienberg 4 D-8000 München 80 / DE | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Jakob, Peter H., et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2009/37] |
Former [1987/02] | Jakob, Peter H., et al Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner, Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/45] | Schneider, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Phys., et al c/o kabelmetal electro GmbH Dipl.-Phys. Wilhelm Schneider Dipl.-Ing. Eberhard Mende Dipl.-Ing. Roger Döring Kabelkamp 20 Postfach 260 D-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101652.0 | 17.02.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | DE19833315830 | 30.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3315830 | [1984/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123803 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123803 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123803 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/28 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
H04B3/28 (EP);
H03F3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1984/45] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Verbesserung des Reduktionsverhaltens | [1984/45] | English: | Interference reduction characteristics circuit | [1984/45] | French: | Circuit pour l'amélioration des caractéristiques de la réduction des interférences | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 16.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.06.1985 | M02   Fee paid on   20.07.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2053626 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH); | [A]US2159927 (CANNON WILLIAM D); | [A]DE2253861 (USINGER WOLFGANG DR RER NAT); | [A]DE1765282 (VER DRAHT & KABELWERKE AG) |