EP0118802 - Gas-cooled alternating current machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1987 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prenner, Herbert Breite 2b CH-5200 Windisch / CH | 02 /
Schröder, Paul Obere Kirchzelg 7 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | [1984/38] | Application number, filing date | 84101717.1 | 20.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | CH19830001304 | 10.03.1983 Original published format: CH 130483 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118802 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118802 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/10, H02K9/02 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
H02K9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Gasgekühlte Wechselstrommaschine | [1984/38] | English: | Gas-cooled alternating current machine | [1984/38] | French: | Machine à courant alternatif refroidie par un gaz | [1984/38] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/42] | 31.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE372328 (AEG); | [A]US3819965 (SCHOENDUBE C); | [A]DE1231797 (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG); | [A]DE1039617 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE688174 (AEG); | [A]US1672680 (FREIBURGHOUSE EDWARD H) |