EP0118803 - Method of terminating fiber optic connector without polishing optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.1991 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPHENOL CORPORATION 358 Hall Avenue P.O.Box 384 Wallingford, CT 06492-0384 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | For all designated states AMPHENOL CORPORATION 358 Hall Avenue P.O.Box 384 Wallingford Connecticut 06492-0384 / US | ||
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Margolin, Mark Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Clanet dit Lamanit, Denis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/08] | Clanet, Denis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/04] | Hasenrader, Hubert Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1987/47] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/38] | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 84101723.9 | 20.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | US19830474099 | 10.03.1983 Original published format: US 474099 | [1984/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118803 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118803 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/26 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/3862 (EP,US);
G02B6/25 (EP,US);
G02B6/3838 (EP,US);
G02B6/3855 (EP,US);
G02B6/3873 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abschliessen einer optischen Faser, ohne die Faser zu polieren | [1984/38] | English: | Method of terminating fiber optic connector without polishing optical fiber | [1984/38] | French: | Procédé pour achever le bout d'une fibre optique sans la polir | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/38] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4182017 (FORD MARK W [GB], et al); | [X]EP0011561 (RADIALL SA [FR]); | [X]GB2052790 (GEN ELECTRIC) |