EP0118815 - Atomic absorption spectrophotometer with feedback [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kosizkij, Vladimir P. Nanga-Parbat-Strasse 43 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/38] | Application number, filing date | 84101884.9 | 23.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1985/17] |
Former [1984/38] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118815 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118815 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
G01N21/3103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | Atom-Absorptionsspektrofotometer mit Rückkopplung | [1984/38] | English: | Atomic absorption spectrophotometer with feedback | [1984/38] | French: | Appareil d'analyse photospectroscopique par absorption atomique à réaction | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 27.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 09.01.1985 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.1986 | 02.03.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.1988 | CH | 01.06.1988 | IT | 01.06.1988 | LI | 01.06.1988 | SE | 30.06.1988 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/27] | AT | 01.06.1988 | |
CH | 01.06.1988 | ||
LI | 01.06.1988 | ||
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/23] | AT | 01.06.1988 | |
SE | 30.06.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 01.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2833553 [ ]; | DE2845426 [ ]; | DE3005784 [ ] | Examination | US4314764 |