EP0130274 - Process for the separation of deuterium and tritium from water by the use of ammonia or a mixture of hydrogen and nitrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mandrin, Charles, Dr. Im Laubegg 7 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1985/02] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101943.3 | 24.02.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | CH19830002453 | 05.05.1983 Original published format: CH 245383 | [1985/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130274 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130274 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130274 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B4/00, B01D59/28 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
B01D59/28 (EP,US);
C01B4/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Deuterium und Tritium aus Wasser unter Verwendung von Ammoniak bzw. eines Wasserstoff-Stickstoff-Gemisches | [1985/02] | English: | Process for the separation of deuterium and tritium from water by the use of ammonia or a mixture of hydrogen and nitrogen | [1985/02] | French: | Procédé pour la séparation du deutérium et du tritium à partir de l'eau en utilisant de l'ammoniac ou un mélange d'hydrogène et d'azote | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB892087 (UHDE GMBH FRIEDRICH); | [A]US3437442 (POOLE KEITH RODERICK); | [A]CH567431 (SULZER AG); | [A]FR2008061 (SULZER AG) |