EP0118822 - Substituted thioamides of hydroxy-malonic acids, process for their preparation and their use as pesticides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.1987 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1987 [1987/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fauss, Rudolf, Dr. Gerstenkamp 10 D-5000 Koeln 80 / DE | 02 /
Findeisen, Kurt, Dr. In der Follmühle 10 D-5068 Odenthal 2 / DE | 03 /
Becker, Benedikt, Dr. Metzkausenerstrasse 14 D-4020 Mettmann / DE | 04 /
Hammann, Ingeborg, Dr. Lutherstrasse 22 D-4330 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | 05 /
Homeyer, Bernhard, Dr. Obere Strasse 28 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1984/38] | Application number, filing date | 84102019.1 | 27.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | DE19833308464 | 10.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3308464 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118822 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118822 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C153/05, A01N37/00, C07F7/18 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
A01N37/36 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/38] | Title | German: | Substituierte Hydroxy-malonsäureamidthioamide, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung als Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel | [1984/38] | English: | Substituted thioamides of hydroxy-malonic acids, process for their preparation and their use as pesticides | [1984/38] | French: | Thioamides d'acides hydroxy-maloniques substitués, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme pesticides | [1984/38] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2533716 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [Y]EP0076957 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, Band 51, Nr. 2, März 1968, Seiten 325-339 J. KISS et al.: "Synthese und Eigenschaften von 2-(alpha-Hydroxyalkyl)- und 2-(alpha-alkoxycarbonyl)-substituierten 4-Methyl-5-(beta-hydroxyäthyl)-thiazolen und -thiazoliumsalzen" |