EP0153429 - Interfitting and removable modular storage units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bishoff, Mark L. 10331 Wild Lake Terrace Columbia Maryland 21044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | For all designated states Bishoff, Mark L. 10331 Wild Lake Terrace Columbia Maryland 21044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/36] | Representative(s) | Lauw, Rudolf Karwinskistrasse 1 81247 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Lauw, Rudolf C. W., Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtschaftsing. Karwinskistrasse 1 D-81247 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Lauw, Rudolf C. W., Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtschaftsing. Karwinskistrasse 1 D-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1988/14] | Lauw, Rudolf C. W. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Zeppelinstrasse 53 D-8000 München 80 / DE | ||
Former [1985/36] | Lauw, Rudolf C. W., Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtschaftsing. Karwinskistrasse 1 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102029.0 | 24.02.1984 | [1985/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0153429 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153429 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A47B87/02, F16B12/46, A47B47/00 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
F16B5/07 (EP,US);
A47B47/0041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/36] | A47B87/02, F16B12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzbare und ausziehbare Module für Lager | [1985/36] | English: | Interfitting and removable modular storage units | [1985/36] | French: | Unités modulaires d'emmagasinage combinables et extractibles | [1985/36] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 27.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 07.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.1990 | BE | 01.08.1990 | FR | 01.08.1990 | IT | 01.08.1990 | NL | 01.08.1990 | SE | 01.08.1990 | GB | 24.02.1991 | CH | 28.02.1991 | LI | 28.02.1991 | LU | 28.02.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
SE | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
GB | 24.02.1991 | ||
CH | 28.02.1991 | ||
LI | 28.02.1991 | ||
LU | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
GB | 24.02.1991 | ||
CH | 28.02.1991 | ||
LI | 28.02.1991 | ||
LU | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
IT | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
GB | 24.02.1991 | ||
CH | 28.02.1991 | ||
LI | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/07] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
GB | 24.02.1991 | ||
CH | 28.02.1991 | ||
LI | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1992/06] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
GB | 24.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/40] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
FR | 21.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
BE | 01.08.1990 | ||
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | AT | 01.08.1990 | |
NL | 01.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 01.08.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US4470647 (BISHOFF MARK L [US], et al); | [XD]US4192562 (BISHOFF MARK L [US], et al); | [X]FR1532502 ; | [Y]GB1138734 (MEUROP SA); | [A]FR1231465 ; | [AD]US3722704 (PIRETTI G); | [AD]US3836218 (HALLAL A); | [A]FR2338409 (VINTHER KNUD [DK]); | [A]CH511342 (PAGANINI TITUS [CH]); | [AD]US3491896 (CRARY THOMAS H); | [A]US2962334 (DUTMERS JAMES E) |