EP0120331 - Method of controlling a high pressure cleaning apparatus, and high pressure cleaning apparatus for carrying it out [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Kärcher GmbH & Co. Leutenbacher Strasse 30-40 D-7057 Winnenden / DE | [1984/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Werner, Ing. grad. Alpenrosenstrasse 5 D-7057 Winnenden-Höfen / DE | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102113.2 | 29.02.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833311382 | 29.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311382 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120331 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120331 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
B05B12/002 (EP,US);
B08B3/026 (EP,US);
B08B3/028 (EP,US);
B08B2203/0282 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0379 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern eines Hochdruckreinigungsgerätes und Hochdruckreinigungsgerät zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1984/40] | English: | Method of controlling a high pressure cleaning apparatus, and high pressure cleaning apparatus for carrying it out | [1984/40] | French: | Procédé pour commander un appareil de nettoyage au jet à haute pression et appareil de nettoyage au jet à haute pression pour effectuer ce procédé | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3369755 [ ] (RODEN RICHARD L, et al); | DE2362139 [ ] (KOLLMAI KLAUS E); | GB1593638 [ ] (GERNI AS); | DE3148898 [ ] (SUTTNER WOLFGANG) |