EP0118100 - Low-pressure discharge lamp with one-sided lamp base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 D-81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steeger, Gerhard, Dr. Rosshauptener Strasse 14 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Plischke, Josef Pfirsichweg 28 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1984/37] | Application number, filing date | 84102130.6 | 29.02.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | DE19833307763 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3307763 | [1984/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118100 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118100 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/34, H01J5/54 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
H01J61/103 (EP);
H01J61/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/37] | Title | German: | Einseitig gesockelte Niederdruckentladungslampe | [1984/37] | English: | Low-pressure discharge lamp with one-sided lamp base | [1984/37] | French: | Lampe à décharge à basse pression avec culot à un côté | [1984/37] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 15.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0061757 [ ] (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | GB2023924 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | US2001501 [ ] (ALFRED RUTTENAUER, et al); | DE2835574 [ ] (PHILIPS NV) | Examination | EP0076503 |