EP0118109 - Trithiophosphonate insecticides, particularly for use in soil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY Westport Connecticut 06881 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | For all designated states STAUFFER CHEMICAL COMPANY Westport Connecticut 06881 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haag, William George 1931 Jeanette Drive Pleasant Hill, CA 94523 / US | 02 /
Shortt, Alexandra Baran 30 Bud Court PLeasant Hill, CA 94523 / US | 03 /
Brimhall, Ronald Stewart 27 Abbey San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102185.0 | 01.03.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | US19830472311 | 04.03.1983 Original published format: US 472311 | [1984/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118109 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/40, A01N57/20 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
A01N57/20 (EP);
C07F9/4075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/37] | Title | German: | Insektizide Trithiphosphonate, besonders für Bodenanwendung | [1984/37] | English: | Trithiophosphonate insecticides, particularly for use in soil | [1984/37] | French: | Insecticides trithiophosphonates, en particulier pour l'utilisation au sol | [1984/37] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/47] | 12.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1258922 ; | [A]EP0024830 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) |