EP0123829 - Thread texturising nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nabulon, Werner Schneihalde 116 CH-8455 Rüdlingen / CH | 02 /
Wirz, Armin Im Grund CH-8475 Ossingen / CH | [1984/45] | Application number, filing date | 84102261.9 | 12.03.1981 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19800136088 | 31.03.1980 Original published format: US 136088 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123829 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123829 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/16 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
D02G1/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/45] | Title | German: | Garntexturierungsdüse | [1984/45] | English: | Thread texturising nozzle | [1984/45] | French: | Tuyère de texturation de fil | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/45] | 12.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP81101805.0 / EP0039763 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1984 | 01.04.1984 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2938257 (BAUER ERNEST K); | [AD]GB872234 (CANADIAN CELANESE LTD); | [AD]US3286321 (FLETCHER CHARLES A, et al); | [AD]US3714686 (HERION D, et al); | [AD]US4100659 (BAUER WOLFGANG, et al) |