EP0121744 - Shuttering for supporting beams under floors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hünnebeck GmbH Am Zechenplatz D-4030 Ratingen 4 - Lintorf / DE | [1984/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markewitz, Wolfgang Zum Schwarzebruch 12 D-4030 Ratingen 6 / DE | 02 /
Schwechheimer, Heinz Denkmalstrasse 21 D-4053 Jüchen 6 / DE | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Gille, Christian, et al Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Gille, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1984/42] | Gille, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Türk, Gille + Hrabal Patentanwälte Bruckner Strasse 20 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102289.0 | 03.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | DE19833312582 | 08.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3312582 | [1984/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121744 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121744 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/40, E04G11/46, E04G13/04 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
E04G13/04 (EP);
E04G11/40 (EP);
E04G11/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Schalung zum Herstellen von Unterzügen an Betondecken | [1984/42] | English: | Shuttering for supporting beams under floors | [1984/42] | French: | Coffrage pour la réalisation de poutres sous dalles | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/14] | 27.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1986 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3140142 ; | [A]FR742281 ; | [A]FR1317089 ; | [A]US2613904 |