EP0121791 - Betaine based cosmetic formulations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIRANOL INC. 68 Culver Road Dayton New Jersey / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states MIRANOL INC. 68 Culver Road Dayton New Jersey / US | ||
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states MIRANOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 68 Culver Road P.O. Box 411 Dayton New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desai, Bharat B. 5 Sebring Round Belle Mead New Jersey / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102577.8 | 09.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830475130 | 14.03.1983 Original published format: US 475130 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121791 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121791 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121791 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/08, A61K7/50 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/442 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Betain enthaltende kosmetische Mittel | [1984/42] | English: | Betaine based cosmetic formulations | [1984/42] | French: | Compositions cosmétiques à base de bétaines | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 23.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3849348 (HEWITT G); | [Y]FR2406439 (MICHAELS EDWIN [US]); | [X]EP0024031 (STERLING DRUG INC [US]); | [X]US4375421 (RUBIN FRED K, et al) | [XP] - SOAP COSMETICS CHEMICAL SPECIALTIES, vol. 60, no. 2, February 1984, pages 56-58b, New York, US; R.J. NADOLSKY et al.: "A new betaine composition for cosmetics" |