EP0120380 - Safety device against non allowed pressure in a container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1987 [1987/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigtländer, Kurt Tulpenhofstrasse 24 D-6050 Offenbach/Main / DE | [1984/40] | Application number, filing date | 84102607.3 | 09.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833310782 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3310782 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120380 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120380 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/14 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
F16K17/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T137/1707 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1767 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1782 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1789 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | Sicherheitseinrichtung gegen unzulässigen Druck in einem Behälter | [1984/40] | English: | Safety device against non allowed pressure in a container | [1984/40] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité contre une surpression intolérable dans une enceinte | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE568051 (NEUMANN BERTHOLD); | [AD]US1970718 (TRYON RICHARD W, et al); | [AD]US2079164 (GLAB WILLIAM N); | [AD]US3279647 (DOP ADRIANUS VAN); | [AD]FR1595660 ; | [AD]FR2044512 (BVS); | [AD]FR2252519 (LABEM [FR]); | [AD]FR2355226 (EURATOM [LU]) | Examination | US3482732 | DE2540597 | DE2706723 | DE2828341 |