EP0120389 - Method of driving a semiconductor laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohnuki, Nobutaka 3-19-1, Minami-yukigaya Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ojima, Masahiro 6-13-8, Higashi-koigakubo Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Arimoto, Akira 902-30, Nakatoh Musashimurayama-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Chinone, Naoki 1-47-3-F202, Akatsuki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/40] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dr. R. Schulz Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 17 Postfach 22 03 45 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102694.1 | 12.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | JP19830044230 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: JP 4423083 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120389 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120389 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120389 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/13, H01S3/10 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
H01S3/00 (KR);
G11B7/13 (EP,US);
H01S5/06216 (EP,US);
H01S5/0654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Halbleiterlasers | [1984/40] | English: | Method of driving a semiconductor laser | [1984/40] | French: | Méthode pour commander un laser à semi-conducteur | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3577018 (WADA TOSHIO, et al); | [A]US3614447 (PAOLI THOMAS L, et al); | [A]US3641459 (PAOLI THOMAS L, et al); | [AD]DE3027318 (HITACHI LTD) |