EP0120411 - Scorch-inhibited elastomeric composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1988 [1988/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON CO., LTD. 6-1, 2-chome, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states NIPPON ZEON CO., LTD. 6-1, 2-chome, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Akio 873, Futoo-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Aonuma, Mitsuyoshi 6-1, Motoyoyogi-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Muranishi, Masahiko 2-26-1, Kajiwara 2-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84102802.0 | 14.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | JP19830048434 | 23.03.1983 Original published format: JP 4843483 | JP19830076209 | 02.05.1983 Original published format: JP 7620983 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120411 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120411 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/37, C08K5/09, C08L11/00, C08L23/28, C08L23/34, C08L71/02 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
C08K5/092 (EP,US);
C08K5/1539 (EP,US);
C08K5/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/40] | Title | German: | Vorvulkanisationsgehinderte Elastomerzusammensetzung | [1984/40] | English: | Scorch-inhibited elastomeric composition | [1984/40] | French: | Composition élastomère à grillage inhibée | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7826849 | [A] - RUBBER CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, vol. 49, no. 4, September 1976, pages 1031-1039, Akron; Y. NAKAMURA et al.: "Evaluation of 2-R-4,6-dithiol-s-triazine for neoprene vulcanization" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 6, 7th August 1978, page 51, no. 44934z, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 78 26 849 (OSAKA SODA CO., LTD.) 13-03-1978, & JP7826849 A 00000000 | [A] - C. BLOW et al.: "Rubber technology and manufacture", 2nd edition, pages 198-201, 1982, Butterworth Scientific, London, GB; | Examination | - Butterworth Scientific, 2nd edition, London (GB); C.BLOW et al.: "Rubber technology and manufacture", 1982, pp. 198-201 |