EP0121836 - Copying machine with typing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1988 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METEOR-SIEGEN Apparatebau Paul Schmeck GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 27 57074 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states METEOR-SIEGEN Apparatebau Paul Schmeck GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 27 D-57074 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kübler, Herbert Am Südhang 54 D-5242 Kirchen / DE | 02 /
Leis, Werner Köhler Weg 7 D-5900 Siegen / DE | 03 /
Isermann, Heinrich Mozartstrasse 41 D-5900 Siegen / DE | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103137.0 | 22.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | DE19833311182 | 26.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311182 | [1984/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121836 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121836 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121836 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/00, G03B27/52 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
G03B27/30 (EP);
G03B27/521 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/42] | G03B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1984/42] | Title | German: | Kopiervorrichtung mit Schreibeinrichtung | [1984/42] | English: | Copying machine with typing apparatus | [1984/42] | French: | Machine de copiage avec un appareil dactylographique | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.06.1987 | [1989/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1570884 (AERONAUTICAL GENERAL INSTR); | [YD]DE3132633 (STOCKBURGER H [DE], et al); | [AD]CH416323 (GRETAG AG [CH]); | [A]DE2924155 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |