EP0123878 - Drill tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/45] | Drill assembly | ||
[1987/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1988 [1988/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hermann Bilz GmbH & Co Robert-Koch-Strasse 36 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states Hermann Bilz GmbH & Co Robert-Koch-Strasse 36 D-73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehl, Harry Breite Strasse 68 D-7061 Lichtenwald / DE | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard Patentanwalt Postfach 90 73701 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 90 D-73701 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103140.4 | 22.03.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | DE19833315294 | 27.04.1983 Original published format: DE 3315294 | [1984/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123878 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123878 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
B23B51/00 (EP);
B23B2251/603 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Bohrwerkzeug | [1987/21] | English: | Drill tool | [1987/21] | French: | Outil de perçage | [1987/21] |
Former [1984/45] | Schneidwerkzeug | ||
Former [1984/45] | Drill assembly | ||
Former [1984/45] | Support d'outil et outil de forage | Examination procedure | 06.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 27.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2019753 [ ] (LEDERMANN & CO); | US4248555 [ ] (SATOU MASANORI); | FR2485969 [ ] (GULF & WESTERN MFG CO [US]); | DE3125480 [ ] (STADTWERKE NEU ISENBURG [DE]) |