EP0129004 - Compressor unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISARTALER Schraubenkompressoren GmbH Sudetenstrasse 88 D-8192 Geretsried / DE | [1984/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. In der Baumschule 12 D-6238 Hofheim 3 / DE | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/52] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103237.8 | 23.03.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | DE19833311055 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: DE 3311055 | [1984/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129004 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129004 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/10, F04C29/02, F04C18/16 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
F04C28/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Verdichteranlage | [1984/52] | English: | Compressor unit | [1984/52] | French: | Ensemble compresseur | [1984/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 16.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2020362 [ ] (IMI FLUIDAIR LTD); | DE2846005 [ ] (BAUER HEINZ); | GB2020748 [ ] (KLEIN R); | AT191065B [ ] (WORTHINGTON CORP [US]); | DE2938557 [ ] (ISARTALER SCHRAUBENKOMPRESSOR [DE]) |