EP0121853 - Data processing system having public encryption and private decryption keys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURROUGHS CORPORATION (a Delaware corporation) Burroughs Place Detroit Michigan 48232 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states BURROUGHS CORPORATION (a Delaware corporation) Burroughs Place Detroit Michigan 48232 / US | ||
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states BURROUGHS CORPORATION (a Michigan corporation) Burroughs Place Detroit, Michigan 48232 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnapp, Russell Lawrence 8062 Gold Coast Drive San Diego, Calif. 92126 / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103327.7 | 27.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830481990 | 04.04.1983 Original published format: US 481990 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121853 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121853 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/123 (EP);
G06F2207/7219 (EP);
G06F2221/2107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem mit öffentlichem Chiffrier- und privatem Dechiffrierschlüssel | [1984/42] | English: | Data processing system having public encryption and private decryption keys | [1984/42] | French: | Système de traitement de données à clé de chiffrement publique et à clé de déchiffrement privée | [1984/42] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]FR2529000 ; | [XE]FR2536880 ; | [YD]US4278837 ; | [A]US4262329 | [Y] - AFIPS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 1982, National Computer Conference, Houston, Texas, 7th-10th June 1982, pages 487-492, AFIPS Press, ArlingtonUS; C. MUELLER-SCHLOER et al.: "The implementation of a cryptography-based secure office system" |