EP0121248 - Speaker verification system and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakoe, Hiroaki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103502.5 | 29.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | JP19830054132 | 30.03.1983 Original published format: JP 5413283 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121248 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121248 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10L7/08 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
G10L17/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/41] | G10L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Identitätsprüfung eines Sprechers | [1984/41] | English: | Speaker verification system and process | [1984/41] | French: | Procédé et système de contrôle de l'identité d'un locuteur | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 16.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4363102 (HOLMGREN JOHN E, et al) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, June 6-8, 1977, New York, pages 88-93, IEEE, New York, US; E. BUNGE: "Automatic speaker recognition by computers" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, August 13-15, 1974, Copenhagen, pages 389-393, IEEE, New York, US; G.S. RAMISHVILI: "Experiments on automatic verification of speakers" | [A] - ICASSP 79, 1979 IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech & Signal Processing, April 2-4, 1979, Washington, pages 789-792, IEEE, New York, US; U. HÖFKER et al.: "Structure and performance of an on-line speaker verification system" |