EP0128288 - Method and system for adaptive automatic discrete utterance recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Das, Subrata Kumar RFD 2, Box 53 Granite Springs New York 10527 / US | 02 /
Dixon, Norman Rex RD4, Conolial Drive Katonah New York 10536 / US | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Gasslander, Sten, et al IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Gasslander, Sten, et al IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84103715.3 | 05.04.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | US19830502415 | 08.06.1983 Original published format: US 502415 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128288 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128288 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
G10L15/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/51] | G10L1/04 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur selbstanpassbaren Einzelworterkennung | [1984/51] | English: | Method and system for adaptive automatic discrete utterance recognition | [1984/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de reconnaissance de mots isolés à adaptation automatique | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 16.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.10.1987 | [1997/17] |
Former [1989/10] | NL | 28.10.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2945377 (HAJIME INDUSTRIES); | [A]GB2098773 (ASULAB SA) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, 7th-10th November 1978, Kyoto, JP, pages 985-989, IEEE, New York, US; SEI-ICHI NAKAGAWA et al.: "A real time spoken word recognition system in a large vocabulary with learning capability of speaker differences" |