EP0123954 - Structure containing a layer consisting of polyimide and an inorganic filler and method for producing such a structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakos, Peter 11538 Spicewood Parkway Austin, TX 78750 / US | 02 /
Darrow, Russel E. P.O. Box 381 Endicott, NY 13760 / US | 03 /
Franchak, Nelson P. Smith Road Binghamton, NY 13905 / US | 04 /
Funari, Joseph 149 Meeker Road Vestal, NY 13850 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Louet Feisser, Arnold, et al Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | ||
Former [1984/45] | Suringar, Willem Joachim Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | Application number, filing date | 84103716.1 | 05.04.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830489878 | 29.04.1983 Original published format: US 489878 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123954 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123954 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123954 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
H01L23/49883 (EP);
H05K3/4676 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K1/0306 (EP);
H05K2201/0154 (EP);
H05K2201/0209 (EP);
H05K3/467 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/45] | Title | German: | Schaltungsaufbau, der eine Lage aus Polyimid und einen anorganischen Füllstoff enthält, sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Schaltungsaufbaus | [1984/45] | English: | Structure containing a layer consisting of polyimide and an inorganic filler and method for producing such a structure | [1984/45] | French: | Structure contenant une couche en polyimide et une masse de remplissage inorganique et méthode pour produire cette structure | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 17.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.05.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4246147 ; | [A]FR2128376 ; | [A]DE2413158 ; | [AD]EP0030641 ; | [AD]US3615913 | Examination | - The Multilayer Printed Circuit Board Handbook, J.A. Scarlett, Electrochemical Publications Ltd., 1985, p. 63 |