EP0128290 - Printing with a data stream including merged graphic and alphanumeric data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karnes, Roy Eugene, Jr. 11006 Centennial Tr. Austin Texas 78750 / US | 02 /
McCaskill, Rex Allen 4508 Bridlewood Dr. Austin Texas 78759 / US | 03 /
Nguyen, Khoa Dang 11200 Morning Glory Trail Austin Texas 78750 / US | [1984/51] | Representative(s) | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 84103721.1 | 05.04.1984 | [1984/51] | Priority number, date | US19830493402 | 11.05.1983 Original published format: US 493402 | [1984/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0128290 | Date: | 19.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0128290 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128290 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/153, G06K15/00 | [1984/51] | CPC: |
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0028 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0062 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/51] | Title | German: | Drucken von einem Datenstrom mit gemischten grafischen und alphanumerischen Daten | [1984/51] | English: | Printing with a data stream including merged graphic and alphanumeric data | [1984/51] | French: | Impression d'un flux de données comportant un mélange de données graphiques et alphanumériques | [1984/51] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 14.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1330748 (APPLIED DIGITAL DATA SYST); | [AD]US4338599 (LEININGER STEVEN [US]); | [AD]US4189246 (BARROW NORMAN F [US], et al) | Examination | - XEROX Disclosure Journal, Vol.5, N. 6, page 653 | - IBM ZDB, Vol.22, N.10 pages 4345-4347 |