EP0125462 - Thermally insulating window or door, and composite profile for making a window, door or façade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International GmbH & Co. Karolinenstrasse 1-15 D-33609 Bielefeld / DE | [1988/52] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states SCHÜCO Heinz Schürmann GmbH & Co. Karolinenstrasse 1-15 D-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jäger, Tilo, Dr. Immermannstrasse 7 D-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Tönsmann, Armin Dingerdisser Heide 73 D-4800 Bielefeld 18 / DE | 03 /
Habicht, Siegfried Marderweg 7a D-4811 Leopoldshöhe / DE | 04 /
Höcker, Eitel Horstkotterheide 18 D-4800 Bielefeld 15 / DE | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 84103770.8 | 05.04.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | DE19833316623 | 06.05.1983 Original published format: DE 3316623 | [1984/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125462 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125462 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/26 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
E06B3/26341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Fenster oder Tür in wärmegedämmter Ausführung sowie Verbundprofil zum Herstellen eines Fensters, einer Tür oder einer Fassade | [1984/47] | English: | Thermally insulating window or door, and composite profile for making a window, door or façade | [1984/47] | French: | Fenêtre ou porte isolante thermiquement ainsi que profilé mixte pour fabriquer une fenêtre, porte ou façade | [1984/47] | File destroyed: | 04.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2855360 (KRAUSS THEODOR); | [Y]DE2745166 (FUCHS KG OTTO, et al); | [A]DE2903730 (PHOENIX AG); | [A]FR2372304 (BIERLICH J H [DK]); | [A]DE3012872 (SEELZE & EICHRIEDE FULGURIT [DE]); | [A]DE3024532 (KELLER EBERHARD [DE]) |