EP0125491 - Rotary engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonfilio. Roberto Louis 47-25 198th Street Auburndale New York 11358 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states Bonfilio. Roberto Louis 47-25 198th Street Auburndale New York 11358 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Dragotti, Gianfranco Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | Dragotti, Gianfranco SAIC BREVETTI s.r.l. Galleria San Babila, 4/D I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84104001.7 | 10.04.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | US19830483602 | 11.04.1983 Original published format: US 483602 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125491 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125491 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02B57/08 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
F02B57/08 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B2075/1816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/47] | Title | German: | Umlaufmotor | [1984/47] | English: | Rotary engine | [1984/47] | French: | Moteur rotatif | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/32] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.07.1988 | SE | 13.07.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/24] | SE | 13.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US1878561 (ERICH WIPPERMANN); | [AD]US3605564 (SHOEMAKER ROGER C); | [A]DE2536764 (FLEISCHER PAUL); | [AD]WO8002584 (PRICE BATTEN PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [AP]GB2110311 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) |