EP0126326 - Process for preparing 1,2,4-triazole-3-carboxamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken 755-0052 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD. 12-32, Nishihonmachi 1-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukui, Kiyoshi c/o Polymer Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 8-1, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kakeya, Noboru c/o Polymer Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 8-1, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Taguchi, Mitsushi c/o Polymer Research Laboratory Ube Industries, Ltd. 8-1, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84104643.6 | 25.04.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | JP19830072066 | 26.04.1983 Original published format: JP 7206683 | [1984/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126326 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126326 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/10 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
C07D249/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1,2,4-Triazol-3-carboxamiden | [1984/48] | English: | Process for preparing 1,2,4-triazole-3-carboxamides | [1984/48] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1,2,4-triazole-3-carboxamides | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CS175118 ; | [A]FR1512421 (BELLON LABOR SA ROGER) | [A] - BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, no. 4, 1970, Paris, FR; M. PESSON et al. "Recherches sur les dérivés du triazole-1,2,4. V. Amides N-dialkylés d'acides triazol-1,2,4 yl-5 carboxyliques", pages 1590-1599 |