EP0129025 - Print head for printing one or more lines of indicia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esselte Pendaflex Corporation 71, Clinton Road Garden City New York 11530 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states Esselte Pendaflex Corporation 71, Clinton Road Garden City New York 11530 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beers, Eugene W. 763 Old Jonas Hill Road Lafayette California 94549 / US | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84104691.5 | 09.10.1980 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | US19790088847 | 29.10.1979 Original published format: US 88847 | [1984/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129025 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129025 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B41K3/06 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
B65C11/0247 (EP,US);
B41K3/06 (EP,US);
B41K3/60 (EP,US);
B41K5/023 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0045 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0059 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Druckwerk zum Drucken einer oder mehrerer Reihen vn Zeichen | [1984/52] | English: | Print head for printing one or more lines of indicia | [1984/52] | French: | Tête d'impression pour une ou plusieurs lignes de symboles | [1984/52] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80106132.6 / EP0027934 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1560650 ; | [A]DE1561340 (DAT FABRIK EMIL FURTWAENGLER G); | [A]US3972281 (SAMS BERNARD); | [A]DE2638441 (PRIMARK CORP) |