EP0126332 - Key card receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | ||
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 600 Grant Street Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Eric G. 2824 Stonebury Rochester Michigan 48063 / US | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | ||
Former [1984/48] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84104693.1 | 26.04.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | US19830496042 | 19.05.1983 Original published format: US 496042 | [1984/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0126332 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0126332 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126332 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/00, G06K7/00 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
G06K13/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/16] | H05K5/00, G06K7/00 | ||
Former IPC [1984/48] | G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Kennkartenaufnehmer | [1984/48] | English: | Key card receiver | [1984/48] | French: | Récepteur de cartes d'identité | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 10.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2717372 ; | [A]DE2822968 (ATARI INC); | [A]US4097728 (GENEST LEONARD J, et al); | [A]DE8126368U |