EP0125608 - Single longitudinal mode semiconductor laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mito, Ikuo c/o NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84105167.5 | 08.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | JP19830080378 | 09.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8037883 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125608 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125608 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125608 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/19 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
H01S5/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/47] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser in longitudinalem Einmodenbetrieb | [1984/47] | English: | Single longitudinal mode semiconductor laser | [1984/47] | French: | Laser à semi-conducteur à mode longitudinal unique | [1984/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0000557 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]GB1555350 (XEROX CORP); | [A]EP0002827 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [AP]EP0106305 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [AP]GB2115218 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 17, no. 25, 10th December 1981, pages 945-947, Hitchin, Herts, GB; Y. ABE et al.: "GaInAsP/InP integrated laser with butt-jointed built-in distributed-Bragg-reflection waveguide" | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 18, no. 2, 21st January 1982, pages 77-78, Hitchin, Herts, GB; S. AKIBA et al.: "Low-threshold-current distributed-feedback InGaAsP/InP CW lasers" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 26, no. 11, 1st June 1975, pages 644-647, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; R.D. BURNHAM et al.: "Low-divergence beams from grating-coupled composite guide heterostructure GaAlAs diode lasers" |